Bowers v. Flo Mechanical LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Flo Mechanical LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00392
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1. re #14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, by Flo Mechanical LLC. (Rhodunda, William) Modified on 4/24/2019 (nms).
April 23, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice filed at D.I. 15 as a motion has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the notice using the "Notice - other" filing code and link the notice back to the motion it relates with. (nms)
April 22, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/6/2019. (nms)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer - filed by Flo Mechanical LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order)(Rhodunda, William) Modified on 4/23/2019 (nms).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/20/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/18/2019. (lih)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents directed to Defendant, filed by Eric Bowers.(Nwaeze, Oderah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by Flo Mechanical LLC.(Rhodunda, William)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1), by Eric Bowers. (Nwaeze, Oderah) Modified on 4/8/2019 (nms).
April 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 9/27/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/29/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A two day Jury Trial is set to start 6/8/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2019. (nms)
April 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2019. Local counsel present for plaintiff: O. Nwaeze. Local counsel present for defendant: N. Kondraschow. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (crb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Oderah C. Nwaeze, regarding proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nwaeze, Oderah) Modified on 3/29/2019 (nms).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/1/2019, at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2019. (nms) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/26/2019) (nms).
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Flo Mechanical LLC. (Rhodunda, William)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Flo Mechanical LLC.(Rhodunda, William)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Eric Bowers. Flo Mechanical LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
February 27, 2019 Remark : Copyright form mailed to U.S. Copyright Office as they are not set-up to receive electronic notification. (rwc)
February 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Flo Mechanical LLC on 2/27/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VA 1-981-315. (rwc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Flo Mechanical LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579890.) - filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Flo Mechanical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flo Mechanical LLC
Represented By: William J. Rhodunda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?