In re: Essar Steel Minnesota LLC et al.
Debtor: Essar Steel Minnesota LLC and ESML Holdings, Inc.
Appellee: B. Riley FBR, Inc.
Appellant: Mesabi Metallics Company LLC and Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00397
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexandria Lattner for Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC and for Mesabi Metallics Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC re #12 MOTION to Stay re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals , #11 Appendix , #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals . (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. #18 per request of counsel. (ntl)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals , #11 Appendix filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Neff, Carl) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/9/2019) (ntl).
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals , #11 Appendix filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Neff, Carl)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals , #11 Appendix filed by B. Riley FBR, Inc.. (Devanney, Katherine)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals filed by B. Riley FBR, Inc.. (Devanney, Katherine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re B. Riley FBR, Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney G. David Dean, II. Attorney Nicholas J. Brannick terminated. (Dean, G.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/29/19. (cak)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals , #11 Appendix - filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Exhibit A)(Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 APPENDIX re #10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals - filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig H. Averch filed by Mesabi Metallics Company LLC, Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexandria Lattner filed by Mesabi Metallics Company LLC, Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald K. Gorsich filed by Mesabi Metallics Company LLC, Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Pastore III filed by B. Riley FBR, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexandria Lattner - filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig H. Averch - filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald K. Gorsich - filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC. (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Pastore III - filed by B. Riley FBR, Inc.. (Brannick, Nicholas)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by B. Riley FBR, Inc. (Appellee B. Riley FBR, Inc.'s Counter Designation of the Record on Appeal) (Brannick, Nicholas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC, Mesabi Metallics Company LLC Amended Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues (Schlerf, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, March 13, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/27/19. (cak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (lak)
February 27, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (lak)
February 27, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 2/14/2019 by The Honorable Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 18-50833 (BLS). Fee Status Paid. - filed by Mesabi Metallics Company LLC, Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Essar Steel Minnesota LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Essar Steel Minnesota LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: ESML Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: B. Riley FBR, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. Devanney
Represented By: Nicholas Jaison Brannick
Represented By: G. David Dean, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mesabi Metallics Company LLC
Represented By: Carl Douglas Neff
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Represented By: Alexandria Lattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chippewa Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Carl Douglas Neff
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schlerf
Represented By: Alexandria Lattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?