Keys v. Hanover Foods Corp.
Plaintiff: Karriem Keys
Defendant: Hanover Foods Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00435
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hanover Foods Corp..(Russell, Lauren)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/14/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/11/2019. (nmf)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Karriem Keys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(King, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hanover Foods Corp.. (Russell, Lauren)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hanover Foods Corp..(Russell, Lauren)
March 27, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #5 has been corrected to reflect that it is a Summons returned executed rather than a subpoena. (fms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to HANOVER FOODS CORP. on 03/11/2019 (King, Christopher) Modified on 3/27/2019 (fms).
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of Hanover Foods Corp. (Russell, Lauren)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Willoughby on behalf of Hanover Foods Corp. (Willoughby, Barry)
March 6, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Pennsylvania office per filing party's request. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Hanover Foods Corp. on 3/1/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Hanover Foods Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2583665.) - filed by Karriem Keys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keys v. Hanover Foods Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Foods Corp.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Represented By: Barry M. Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karriem Keys
Represented By: Christopher Robert King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?