Cipla Limited et al v. AstraZeneca AB et al

Plaintiff: Cipla Limited and Cipla USA, Inc.
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB, Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Zeneca Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00438
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER // Scheduling Order by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Honorable Maryellen Noreika regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/29/2019 (dlw).
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. (Kelly, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/27/2019. (dlw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc..(Silver, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. Zeneca Inc. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. Aktiebolaget Hassle served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. AstraZeneca AB served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Wilson, Samantha) Modified on 3/7/2019 (dlw).
March 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Nature of Suit Code. (rwc)
March 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a redacted version of the Complaint by 3/8/19. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/19. (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Remark : Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aktiebolaget Hassle on 3/1/2019; AstraZeneca AB on 3/1/2019; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 3/1/2019; Zeneca Inc. on 3/1/2019. (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Parent Cipla Limited, Corporate Parent Cipla (EU Limited) for Cipla USA, Inc. filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,428,810. (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 8/31/18. Date of Expiration of Patent: 11/3/19. (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Consent Form) (rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY - filed against Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 31435.) - filed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(rwc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rwc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cipla Limited et al v. AstraZeneca AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aktiebolaget Hassle
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla Limited
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?