Gonzalez v. Mehrotra et al

Plaintiff: Jessie Gonzalez
Defendant: Ernest E. Maddock, Sanjay Mehrotra, Laurence N. Mondry, Richard M. Beyer, Patrick J. Byrne, Robert E. Switz, Mercedes Johnson, Robert L. Bailey and David A. Zinsner
Nominal Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00446
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Complaint to May 7, 2019 filed by Micron Technology, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/15/2019. (fms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Complaint to May 7, 2019 - filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (DiCamillo, Raymond)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 16, 2019 filed by Micron Technology, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Micron Technology, Inc. answer due 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/26/2019. (nmf)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 16, 2019 - filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (DiCamillo, Raymond)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessie Gonzalez. Micron Technology, Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Micron Technology, Inc. on 3/5/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Robert L. Bailey, Richard M. Beyer, Patrick J. Byrne, Mercedes Johnson, Ernest E. Maddock, Sanjay Mehrotra, Micron Technology, Inc., Laurence N. Mondry, Robert E. Switz, David A. Zinsner - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2585043.) - filed by Jessie Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Mehrotra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest E. Maddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjay Mehrotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence N. Mondry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Switz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?