BI Investment, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: BI Investment, LLC and BioZyme Incorporated
Defendant: James D. Smith and Flat Rox Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00531
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Judge Fallon from Eric Lopez Schnabel regarding Judge Fallon Acting as Mediator. (Schnabel, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) re #12 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith.(O'Neill, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by BI Investment, LLC.(Glorioso, Alessandra)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 12/11/2019. Opening Expert Reports due by 1/15/2020. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 1/29/2020. Expert Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Status Report due by 11/13/2019. A Status Conference is set for 3/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/14/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 3-day Bench Trial is set to begin on for 8/31/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/2/2019. (lih)
July 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Rogin on behalf of Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith (Rogin, Alexandra)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Judge Fallon, from Alessandra Glorioso, regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Glorioso, Alessandra) Modified on 6/27/2019 (nms).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 7/2/2019 at 1:30 PM. The Court requests that each person wishing to join the call do so by individually dialing in to 302-573-6002. The conference line will be open at 12:55 for parties to start joining. Prior to that, no party can join the call. For the person calling in, the phone will just stop ringing once they are connected to the call. Once a party joins the call, they will simply hear a beep when another party joins. The Court requests that someone take the lead in taking roll call prior to Chambers joining the line to ensure that all parties are on the line. At 1:00 PM, someone from our Chambers will join the call and ask if all parties are on the line and if the call is ready for the Judge. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 6/27/2019. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/12/2019. (lih)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. (nms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith. (O'Neill, Brian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith.(O'Neill, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. O'Neill on behalf of Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith (O'Neill, Brian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by BioZyme Incorporated, BI Investment, LLC: For Flat Rox Incorporated waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by BioZyme Incorporated, BI Investment, LLC: For James D. Smith waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Flat Rox Incorporated on 5/1/2019; James D. Smith on 5/1/2019. (nmg)
March 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Case Collard for BI Investment, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Case Collard, filed by BI Investment, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/20/2019. (nms)
March 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Case Collard - filed by BI Investment, LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
March 18, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Flat Rox Incorporated, James D. Smith - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2597314.) - filed by BioZyme Incorporated, BI Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BI Investment, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI Investment, LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Schnabel
Represented By: Alessandra Glorioso
Represented By: Case Collard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BioZyme Incorporated
Represented By: Eric L. Schnabel
Represented By: Alessandra Glorioso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Brian E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Rox Incorporated
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Brian E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?