Watson v. Does
Plaintiff: David M. Watson
Defendant: John Does
Case Number: 1:2019cv00551
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for counsel (D.I. #4 ) is DISMISSED as moot. The Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/23/2019. (nms)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $26.22 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/2/2019. (nmg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Trust Fund Account Statement, by David M. Watson (Attachments: #1 Letter) (sar) Modified on 4/3/2019 (nms).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/29/2019.). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2019. (nmg)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by David M. Watson. (sar)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against John Does - filed by David M. Watson.(sar)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by David M. Watson. (sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?