SynKloud Technologies, LLC v. BLU Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies, LLC
Defendant: BLU Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,098,526; 9,219,780; 10,015,254. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SO ORDERED Granting #15 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2019. (nms)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice, by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean) Modified on 6/19/2019 (nms).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing on Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer. Answering Brief due 6/20/2019, Reply Brief due 7/8/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. (nms)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing, by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean) Modified on 6/11/2019 (nms).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer. Answering Brief due 6/10/2019, Reply Brief due 6/27/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2019. (nms)
June 2, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to 6/10/2019 - filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer. Answering Brief due 5/30/2019, Reply Brief due 6/17/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/21/2019. (nms)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing on Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean) Modified on 5/21/2019 (nms).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer. Answering Brief due 5/20/2019, Reply Brief due 6/6/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2019. (nms)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean) Modified on 5/8/2019 (nms).
April 24, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2019. (nms)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, To Transfer - filed by BLU Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Butler, Dennis) Modified on 4/24/2019 (nms).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to April 29, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: BLU Products, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/16/2019. (nms)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to April 29, 2019 - filed by BLU Products, Inc.. (Simmons, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Simmons on behalf of BLU Products, Inc. (Simmons, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis James Butler on behalf of BLU Products, Inc. (Butler, Dennis)
March 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel S. Carlineo for SynKloud Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Carlineo, filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2019. (nms)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. BLU Products, Inc. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Brennecke, Sean)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Carlineo - filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
March 22, 2019 No Summons Issued. (ceg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,098,526; 9,219,780; 10,015,254. (ceg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against BLU Products, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2601582.) - filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SynKloud Technologies, LLC v. BLU Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Daniel S. Carlineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLU Products, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis James Butler
Represented By: John David Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?