Joles v. City of Milford et al

Plaintiff: James E. Joles
Defendant: City of Milford, Kenneth L. Brown and Mayor Arthur J. Campbell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00613
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Motion to Dismiss to July 31, 2019 filed by James E. Joles. Set Briefing Schedule: re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 7/31/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/3/2019. (fms)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Motion to Dismiss to July 31, 2019 - filed by James E. Joles. (Junge, Gary)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2019. (Episcopo, Helene)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Episcopo, Helene)
June 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R. Miller for Kenneth L. Brown,for Arthur J. Campbell, for City of Milford added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Miller, Esquire filed by City of Milford, Arthur J. Campbell, Kenneth L. Brown. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/13/2019. (fms)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Miller, Esquire - filed by Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford. (Episcopo, Helene)
June 6, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #9 has been re-docketed using the correct docket event. Counsel should have used COMPLAINT - AMENDED, found under, COMPLAINTS, OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS (fms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT and PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford- filed by James E. Joles.(fms)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint and for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to 1. Plaintiff has until June 12, 2019 to file the Amended Complaint, 2. Defendants have twenty (20) days from filed by City of Milford, Arthur J. Campbell, Kenneth L. Brown. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/30/2019. (fms)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint and for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to 1. Plaintiff has until June 12, 2019 to file the Amended Complaint, 2. Defendants have twenty (20) days from the date filed to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. - filed by Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford. (Mondros, Herbert)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 31, 2019 filed by City of Milford, Arthur J. Campbell, Kenneth L. Brown, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Kenneth L. Brown answer due 5/31/2019; Arthur J. Campbell answer due 5/31/2019; City of Milford answer due 5/31/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/24/2019. (nmf)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 31, 2019 - filed by Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford. (Mondros, Herbert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert Weiswasser Mondros on behalf of Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford (Mondros, Herbert)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E. Joles. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service City of Milford)(Junge, Gary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E. Joles. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Chief Brown)(Junge, Gary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E. Joles. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Mayor Campbell)(Junge, Gary)
April 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Proof of Service filings at D.I. Nos. 3 (Mayor Arthur J. Campbell), 4 (Blank summons form for Kenneth L. Brown) and 5 (City of Milford) have been removed from the docket. Counsel should file only the summons returned executed, not the blank summons form. The SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED docket code should be used to file each individual completed and executed summons. D.I. 4 was removed as it only had attached a blank summons form for Kenneth L. Brown. Counsel should re-file using the docket event SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED and choose each individual defendant for each entry rather than "All Defendants" for an entry for one defendant. (fms)
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kenneth L. Brown on 4/2/2019; Arthur J. Campbell on 4/2/2019; City of Milford on 4/2/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS - filed with Jury Demand against Kenneth L. Brown, Arthur J. Campbell, City of Milford - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2608452.) - filed by James E. Joles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joles v. City of Milford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milford
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Represented By: Michael R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Brown
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Represented By: Michael R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Arthur J. Campbell
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Represented By: Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
Represented By: Michael R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Joles
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?