Richie et al v. Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC and Shalewater Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00649
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #25 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/9/2019. (lih)
July 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 7/9/2019 re #25 MOTION to Dismiss. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M. Steadman on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC (Steadman, Anne)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The court shall hear argument re #25 MOTION to Dismiss on 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have one hour for argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/28/2019. (lih)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST for Oral Argument by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC re #25 MOTION to Dismiss. (Toms, Chad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to #25 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Ross, David) Modified on 5/21/2019 (lih). Modified on 5/21/2019 (nms).
May 14, 2019 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #28 . (lih)
May 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy J. Henderson for James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Certificate of Service)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 5/13/2019 (nms).
May 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kent J. Hayden, Reed S. Oslan for Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 3, 2019 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #25 and #26 . (lih)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER: The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2019. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms)
April 29, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #25 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2019. (nms)
April 29, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #25 MOTION to Dismiss, by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ross, David) Modified on 4/29/2019 (nms).
April 29, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Ross, David) Modified on 4/29/2019 (nms).
April 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy J. Henderson for James Chance Richie, for ShaleApps, LLC, for Shalewater Solutions, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) Modified on 4/29/2019 (myr).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Henderson, filed by Shalewater Solutions, LLC, ShaleApps, LLC, James Chance Richie. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2019. (nms)
April 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Henderson - filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Certification)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 4/25/2019 (nms).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Reed S. Oslan and Kent J. Hayden, filed by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2019. (nms)
April 23, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Reed S. Oslan and Kent J. Hayden - filed by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Ross, David)
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC (Ross, David)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice (D.I. #20 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Certifications by counsel need to be dated as to the day they were signed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2019. (nms)
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Henderson - filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 4/23/2019 (nms).
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Toms on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Toms, Chad)
April 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/9/2019. (nmg)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 Record of case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-00052. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Transfer Case. Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case and Brief in Support by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to three weeks following the entry of an Order transferring this case to the USDC for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reed Oslan for Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent Hayden for Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case and Brief in Support by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Kent Hayden)(Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matt Dow for Reed Olsan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11775747) by on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matt Dow for Kent Hayden ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11775717) by on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matt Dow on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Attorney Matt Dow added to party Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Dow, Matt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC as to Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Henderson, Timothy) Modified on 1/25/2019 to correct date waiver sent (td). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Loev. Sent via e-mail 1/22/2019. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11669740). No Summons requested at this time, filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richie et al v. Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chance Richie
Represented By: Chad J. Toms
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ShaleApps, LLC
Represented By: Chad J. Toms
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalewater Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Chad J. Toms
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Reed S. Oslan
Represented By: Kent J. Hayden
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?