Franklin v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christine Franklin
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00672
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Christine Franklin (Garibian, Antranig)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/7/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/8/2019. (dlw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
May 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Terri R. Brown for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Bennett, Blake)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terri R. Brown filed by Trans Union, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/29/2019. (dlw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terri R. Brown - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Franklin. Trans Union, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Franklin. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 4/11/2019; Trans Union, LLC on 4/11/2019 (*summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (ceg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2617263.) - filed by Christine Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Terri R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Franklin
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?