Phillips v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Gary Duane Phillips
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00677
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Gary Duane Phillips (Garibian, Antranig)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/19. (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Duane Phillips. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 12, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 4/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CONSUMER CREDIT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2617596.) - filed by Gary Duane Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Duane Phillips
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?