Acosta et al v. El Tapatio, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor, R. Alexander Acosta and Secretary of Labor
Defendant: El Tapatio, Inc., Fernando Hernandez and El Tapatio, Inc. doing business as El Tapatio Mexican Restaurant
Case Number: 1:2019cv00681
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT JUDGMENT (see Judgment for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2019. (nms)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 15, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to filing party's Philadelphia office. (lak)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment - filed by R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luby, Andrea) Modified on 4/17/2019 (nms).
April 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to El Tapatio, Inc. on 4/12/2019; Fernando Hernandez on 4/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - (Fee waived) filed against El Tapatio, Inc., Fernando Hernandez - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta et al v. El Tapatio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Andrea C. Luby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Andrea C. Luby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Andrea C. Luby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tapatio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tapatio, Inc. doing business as El Tapatio Mexican Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?