Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00685
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-00689-CFC. (fms)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:19-cv-00685-CFC, 78 in 1:18-cv-00689-CFC) Stipulation regarding Consolidation filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. C.A. No. 19-685 (CFC) shall be consolidated with C.A. No. 18-689 (CFC) for all purposes. All filings shall be in C.A. No. 18-689 (CFC). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00689-CFC, 1:19-cv-00685-CFC(fms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation of Cases by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) APOTEX INC. AND APOTEX CORP.S INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER PARAGRAPH 3 OF THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARES DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) and (2) APOTEX INC. AND APOTEX CORP.S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(a)(1) filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Francella, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Identifications of Accused Products, (2) Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (3) Plaintiff Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kira A. Davis, Eric A. Stone, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein, Nicholas Groombridge, and Jennifer R. Deneault for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 1:19-cv-00685-CFC, 1:19-cv-00926-CFC(nmg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 10 in 1:19-cv-00926-CFC, 72 in 1:18-cv-00651-CFC, 76 in 1:18-cv-00689-CFC, 73 in 1:18-cv-00690-CFC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00685-CFC) Joint STIPULATION regarding Case Schedule and Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. 10,149,829. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00651-CFC et al.(nmf)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION regarding Case Schedule and Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. 10,149,829 by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 15 in 1:19-cv-00685-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order to May 31, 2019 filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 1:19-cv-00685-CFC(fms)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order to May 31, 2019 - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
May 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Keri L. Schaubert, Aaron S. Lukas, William Blake Coblentz, Barry P. Golob for Apotex Corp., for Apotex Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry P. Golob, W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Keri L. Schaubert filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/14/2019. (fms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry P. Golob, W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Keri L. Schaubert - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Francella, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (12 in 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 12 in 1:19-cv-00685-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas Groombridge filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 1:19-cv-00685-CFC(fms)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:19-cv-00685-CFC, 11 in 1:19-cv-00560-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Alan Stone, Kira A. Davis, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein and Jennifer Rea Deneault filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00560-CFC, 1:19-cv-00685-CFC(fms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas Groombridge - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Alan Stone, Kira A. Davis, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein and Jennifer Rea Deneault - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
May 7, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. for Apotex Inc. (fms)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Francella, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Francella, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr on behalf of Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. (Francella, Thomas)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Apotex Inc. served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Fahnestock, Derek)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Apotex Corp. served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Fahnestock, Derek)
April 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apotex Corp. on 4/15/2019; Apotex Inc. on 4/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (myr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,149,829. (myr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/28/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 01/25/2033.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/31/2021. (myr) Modified on 4/15/2019 (myr).
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2618711.) - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Aaron S. Lukas
Represented By: Barry P. Golob
Represented By: William Blake Coblentz
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Represented By: Keri L. Schaubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Aaron S. Lukas
Represented By: Barry P. Golob
Represented By: William Blake Coblentz
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Represented By: Keri L. Schaubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer R. Deneault
Represented By: Josephine Young
Represented By: Kira A. Davis
Represented By: Daniel J. Klein
Represented By: Nicholas Groombridge
Represented By: Eric A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?