Wright v. DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Wright
Defendant: DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00717
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdraw of Counsel by Robert Wright (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service)(Allen, Michele)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bianca N. Iozzia, Esq. filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie J. Peet, Esq. filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/19. (ntl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bianca N. Iozzia, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie J. Peet, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC (Russell, Lauren)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robert Wright: For DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Allen, Michele)
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 22, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2624344) - filed by Robert Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wright
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?