Frederick v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Frederick
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Rio Tinto Mineral Services Inc., Rio Tinto Minerals Inc., Luzenac America, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Baby Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00726
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and [Proposed] Order filed by Jennifer Frederick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Hrubiec, R.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and [Proposed] Order filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/10/2019. (Kelly, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jennifer Frederick.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 5/20/2019 (dlw).
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and [Proposed] Order - filed by Jennifer Frederick. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 5/20/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Kelly, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2019 (dlw).
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kelly, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Plaintiff Pursuant to Rule 9027(e)(3) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure with Certificate of Service by Jennifer Frederick. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 5/2/2019 (dlw).
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00103-MN and 1:19-cv-00711-MN, 1:19-cv-00718-MN thru 1:19-cv-00721-MN, 1:19-cv-00723-MN, 1:19-cv-00724-MN and 1:19-cv-00726-MN thru 1:19-cv-00728-MN (rjb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18C-06-056 TAL (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2624919)- filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Mineral Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Minerals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzenac America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Baby Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Frederick
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?