Starr v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Starr
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Luzenac America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Baby Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00728
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and/or Abstain from Exercising Jurisdiction filed by Cynthia Starr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Warner, Raeann)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and/or Abstain from Exercising Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/12/2019. (Kelly, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and/or Abstain from Exercising Jurisdiction filed by Cynthia Starr.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Warner, Raeann)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and/or Abstain from Exercising Jurisdiction - filed by Cynthia Starr. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement)(Warner, Raeann) Modified on 5/23/2019 (dlw).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Kelly, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2019 (dlw).
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT Pursuant to 9027(e)(3) re #1 Notice of Removal by Cynthia Starr. (Warner, Raeann) Modified on 5/23/2019 (dlw).
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kelly, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00103-MN and 1:19-cv-00711-MN, 1:19-cv-00718-MN thru 1:19-cv-00721-MN, 1:19-cv-00723-MN, 1:19-cv-00724-MN and 1:19-cv-00726-MN thru 1:19-cv-00728-MN (rjb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N17C-05-295 TAL (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2624989)- filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Starr
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMJ Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzenac America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Baby Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?