Kang v. Forever 21 Retail Inc.
Plaintiff: Jack Kang
Defendant: Forever 21 Retail Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00770
Filed: April 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant Forever 21, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Forever 21 Retail Inc..(Cronin, Laurence)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by Forever 21 Retail Inc. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Cronin, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Jack Kang.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/24/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Forever 21, Inc. for Forever 21 Retail Inc. filed by Forever 21 Retail Inc.. (Cronin, Laurence)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Forever 21 Retail Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/17/2019. (Cronin, Laurence)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Forever 21 Retail Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cronin, Laurence)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Kang. Forever 21 Retail Inc. served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00770-LPS, 1:19-cv-00771-LPS (rjb)
April 29, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Forever 21 Retail Inc. on 4/29/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
April 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Forever 21 Retail Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2629430.) - filed by Jack Kang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. Forever 21 Retail Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kang
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21 Retail Inc.
Represented By: Laurence V. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?