Simpson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Simpson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00774
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Judge Stark from Commissioner regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule. (Benderson, Heather)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule to the Court no later than July 3, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/27/19. (ntl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Transcript of Social Security Proceedings re #4 Transcript (Social Security Record),,, #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records Part 10, #2 Exhibit Medical Records Part 11, #3 Exhibit Medical Records Part 12, #4 Exhibit Medical Records Part 13, #5 Exhibit Medical Records Part 14, #6 Exhibit Medical Records Part 15, #7 Exhibit Medical Records Part 16, #8 Exhibit Medical Records Part 17, #9 Exhibit Medical Records Part 18, #10 Exhibit Medical Records Part 19, #11 Exhibit Medical Records Part 20, #12 Exhibit Medical Records Part 21, #13 Exhibit Medical Records Part 22)(Benderson, Heather)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Transcript of Social Security Proceedings re #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Transcript, #2 Exhibit Documents Related to Administrative, #3 Exhibit Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Exhibit Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Exhibit Non Disability Related Development, #6 Exhibit Disability Related Development Part 1, #7 Exhibit Disability Related Development Part 2, #8 Exhibit Medical Records Part 1, #9 Exhibit Medical Records Part 2, #10 Exhibit Medical Records Part 3, #11 Exhibit Medical Records Part 4, #12 Exhibit Medical Records Part 5, #13 Exhibit Medical Records Part 6, #14 Exhibit Medical Records Part 7, #15 Exhibit Medical Records Part 8)(Benderson, Heather)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Benderson, Heather)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 30, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General on 4/30/2019. (nmg)
April 29, 2019 No Summons Issued. (ceg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Nancy A. Berryhill - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2630034.) - filed by Gregory C. Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Simpson
Represented By: John S. Whitelaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?