Bowman v. Barclays Bank of Delaware

Plaintiff: Brian Bowman
Defendant: Barclays Bank of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv00830
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jessica Ellis and James A. Lewis for Brian Bowman added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First, Second and Fourth Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Brian Bowman.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2019. (Warner, Raeann)
June 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Asima J. Ahmad for Barclays Bank of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark Blondman for Barclays Bank of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Lewis filed by Brian Bowman, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica Ellis filed by Brian Bowman, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Blondman and Asima J. Ahmad filed by Barclays Bank of Delaware. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/19. (ntl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Blondman and Asima J. Ahmad - filed by Barclays Bank of Delaware. (Orlacchio, Adam)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica Ellis - filed by Brian Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warner, Raeann)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Lewis - filed by Brian Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warner, Raeann)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First, Second and Fourth Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice filed by Barclays Bank of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlacchio, Adam)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First, Second and Fourth Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice - filed by Barclays Bank of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orlacchio, Adam)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Barclays Bank of Delaware on 5/6/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with jury demand against Barclays Bank of Delaware - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2634370.) - filed by Brian Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) Modified on 5/6/2019 (myr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Barclays Bank of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank of Delaware
Represented By: Asima J. Ahmad
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Represented By: Mark Blondman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bowman
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: James A. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?