10x Genomics, Inc. v. Celsee, Inc.
Plaintiff: 10x Genomics, Inc.
Defendant: Celsee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00862
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #52 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the transcript of the 1/22/2020 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2020. (lih)
January 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2020. (Court Reporter S. Vickers (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
January 21, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The deficiency notice regarding D.I. #64 has been deleted. (lih)
January 17, 2020 Filing 64 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III - re #63 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lih).
January 16, 2020 Filing 63 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Protective Order Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Farnan, Brian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s First Amended Initial Disclosures filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 13, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE to #53 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/14/2020 (lih).
January 13, 2020 Filing 60 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against 10x Genomics, Inc. by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Prachi V. Mehta for Celsee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Celsee, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) to Plaintiff 10x Genomics, Inc. and (ii) Celsee, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-89) to Plaintiff 10x Genomics, Inc. filed by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Prachi V. Mehta filed by Celsee, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/6/2020. (fms)
January 3, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Prachi V. Mehta - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/30/2019. (lih)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #53 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike. (Answering Brief due 1/13/2020., Reply Brief due 1/23/2020.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/30/2019. (lih)
December 30, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Counterclaims and Defenses and (ii) for Plaintiff to file a reply brief to (i) January 13, 2020 and (ii) January 23, 2020 - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #53 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2019. Motion referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(fms)
December 23, 2019 Filing 54 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #53 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2020. (Cottrell, Frederick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike Defendant's Counterclaims and Defenses - filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #52 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Celsee, Inc. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submissions due by no later than 12:00 p.m. on 1/16/2020; Responsive submissions due by no later than 12:00 p.m. on 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/23/2019. (Polito, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Celsee, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew L. Perito for 10x Genomics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 51 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jason J. Rawnsley regarding Submission of Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rawnsley, Jason)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew L. Perito filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/20/2019. (fms)
December 19, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew L. Perito - filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
December 16, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #41 Joint MOTION For Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall submit a proposed stipulated protective order in accordance with the court's ruling by no later than close of business on 12/20/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the transcript of the 12/16/2019 discovery dispute hearing shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon 12/16/2019. (lih)
December 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2019. (Court Reporter Patrick O'Hare.) (lih)
December 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s ESI Disclosures filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 12, 2019 Filing 46 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan - re #45 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/13/2019 (lih).
December 11, 2019 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #45 . (lih)
December 11, 2019 Filing 45 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Dispute concerning the Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits A-C)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 12/11/2019 (lih).
December 10, 2019 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding 10X's Request to Modify the Briefing Schedule - re #43 Letter. (Farnan, Brian)
December 10, 2019 Filing 43 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding briefing procedure for protective order dispute. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 12/11/2019 (lih).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #41 Joint MOTION For Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 12/11/2019; Responsive submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 12/12/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/9/2019. (lih)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Rescheduling Hearings: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 7/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/6/2019. (nmf)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SO ORDERED, re #40 Stipulated Order re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/6/2019. (fms)
December 5, 2019 Filing 41 Joint MOTION For Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute - filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Rawnsley, Jason)
December 5, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Order re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Celsee, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) and (ii) Celsee, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-21) filed by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against 10x Genomics, Inc. by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/4/2019 (lih).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORAL ORDER: If during the history of this case, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) jointly wish to schedule a form of alternative dispute resolution ("ADR"), such as mediation, with Judge Burke, they should contact chambers by e-mail at Deborah_Benyo@ded.uscourts.gov or by phone. Additionally, if either side wishes to speak ex parte with Judge Burke regarding ADR matters, they may contact chambers via e-mail or by phone to arrange a time for a call. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/22/2019. (dlb)
November 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (cak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Celsee, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Celsee, Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 10X Genomics, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,392,662 B1 ;10,400,280 B2 . (Cottrell, Frederick)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING #23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting in part #11 Motion to Dismiss; denying #11 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend has been granted #30 , and the court has filed the amended complaint at D.I. #31 . Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/14/2019. (nmf)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Fact Discovery completed by 9/18/2020. A Status Conference is set for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon Status Report due by 4/10/2020. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 3/20/2020. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/15/2020. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 5/1/2020. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 5/15/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/30/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/3/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A 7 day Jury Trial is set to begin on 6/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/14/2019. (lih)
November 14, 2019 PATENT REPORT NOTICE: Please note that if patents are being added to this case, the filing party should complete the Report to Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The patent report form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (fms)
November 14, 2019 Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Celsee, Inc.- filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.(fms)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED, re #28 Stipulation nd Order Regarding Amended Complaint filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/14/2019. (fms)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED Scheduling Order by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 11/13/2019 (lih).
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #27 STIPULATION Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Objections to Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/7/2019. (lih)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Objections to Report and Recommendations by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
November 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2019. (Court Reporter J. Guy.) (lih)
November 1, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff 10X Genomics, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Celsee, Inc. filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Proposed Scheduling Order to 11/1/2019 filed by Celsee, Inc.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/1/2019. (Polito, Rebecca)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a Proposed Scheduling Order to 11/1/2019 - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike filed by Celsee, Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/30/2019. (Polito, Rebecca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Rule 16 Conference. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 10/2/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike. (Court Reporter J. Guy.) (lih)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III - re #13 Answering Brief in Opposition.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/26/2019 (lih).
September 26, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #13 has been replaced with a revised version of the document per the request of counsel. (lih)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 AM.. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 10/31/2019. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/6/2019. (lih)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The court shall hear argument re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Strike on 10/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have two hours for argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/6/2019. (lih)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Plaintiff's July 31, 2019 Letter - re #19 Letter. (Farnan, Brian)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #19 Letter. IT IS HERBEY ORDERED that the defendant shall file a response, limited to no more than two pages, by no later than close of business on 8/2/2019. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/1/2019. (lih)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 8/1/2019 (lih).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for scheduling purposes and all disputes relating to discovery or the protective order. ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike filed by Celsee, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/26/2019. (nmf)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Oral Argument by 10x Genomics, Inc. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike . (Rawnsley, Jason)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Plaintiff's July 24, 2019 Letter - re #15 Letter. (Farnan, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Request for Scheduling Conference. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eneda Hoxha for 10x Genomics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eugene Novikov for 10x Genomics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daralyn J. Durie for 10x Genomics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
July 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henry H. Cornillie for 10x Genomics, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike filed by Celsee, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/15/2019. (Farnan, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff 10x Genomics, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by 10x Genomics, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randi W. Singer filed by Celsee, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/28/2019. (fms)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randi W. Singer - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter for Celsee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter filed by Celsee, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Eugene Novikov, Eneda Hoxha, and Henry H. Cornillie filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/17/2019. (nmf)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 7/1/2019 filed by Celsee, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Celsee, Inc. answer due 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/17/2019. (nmf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Eugene Novikov, Eneda Hoxha, and Henry H. Cornillie - filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 7/1/2019 - filed by Celsee, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. Celsee, Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Celsee, Inc. on 5/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 10x Genomics, Inc. (lak)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,155,981 B2 ;10,227,648 B2 ;10,240,197 B1 ;10,273,541 B2 ;10,280,459 B1. (lak)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Celsee, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2637771.) - filed by 10x Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Attachment A, #13 Attachment B, #14 Attachment C, #15 Attachment D, #16 Attachment E, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 10x Genomics, Inc. v. Celsee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 10x Genomics, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Henry H. Cornillie
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Eneda Hoxha
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Represented By: Andrew L. Perito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celsee, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Represented By: Edward R. Reines
Represented By: Prachi V. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?