In re: Exide Technologies

Appellee: Exide Technologies
Appellant: South Coast Air Quality Management District
Case Number: 1:2019cv00891
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/17/19. (cak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Exide Technologies. (Clark, Anthony)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Exide Technologies Appellees Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Item No. 26, #2 Item No. 27, #3 Item No. 28, #4 Item No. 29, #5 Item No. 30, #6 Item No. 31, #7 Item No. 32, #8 Item No. 33, #9 Item No. 34, #10 Item No. 35, #11 Item No. 36, #12 Item No. 37, #13 Item No. 38, #14 Item No. 39, #15 Item No. 40, #16 Item No. 41)(Clark, Anthony)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Justin M. Winerman of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP filed by Exide Technologies, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Louis S. Chiappetta of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP filed by Exide Technologies, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of James J. Mazza, Jr. of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP filed by Exide Technologies, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of J. Eric Ivester of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP filed by Exide Technologies. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/4/19. (ntl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Justin M. Winerman of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP - filed by Exide Technologies. (Clark, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Louis S. Chiappetta of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP - filed by Exide Technologies. (Clark, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of James J. Mazza, Jr. of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP - filed by Exide Technologies. (Clark, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of J. Eric Ivester of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP - filed by Exide Technologies. (Clark, Anthony)
May 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Pfister, Thomas E. Patterson for South Coast Air Quality Management District added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha M. Gurvitz filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Pfister filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Patterson filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/17/19. (ntl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha M. Gurvitz - filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District. (Cree, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Pfister - filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District. (Cree, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Patterson - filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District. (Cree, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, June 4, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/14/19. (cak)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (ddp)
May 13, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (ddp)
May 13, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (ddp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 4/30/2019 by The Honorable Kevin J. Carey in Bankruptcy case number 13-11482. Fee Status Paid.- filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Exide Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Exide Technologies
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: South Coast Air Quality Management District
Represented By: Kerri King Mumford
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Robert J. Pfister
Represented By: Thomas E. Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?