Nusbaum v. Adamczyk et al
Plaintiff: Steven R. Nusbaum
Defendant: Thomas A. Szlosek, Clive R. Hollick, Grace D. Lieblein, Jamie Chico Pardo, Robin L. Washington, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, Linnet F. Deily, Darius E. Adamczyk, George Paz, Judd A. Gregg, William S. Ayer, Duncan B. Angove, Greg Lewis, D. Scott Davis and Jaime Chico Pardo
Nominal Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00898
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Thomas A. Szlosek: For Thomas A. Szlosek waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Greg Lewis: For Greg Lewis waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David M. Cote: For David M. Cote waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robin L. Washington: For Robin L. Washington waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by George Paz: For George Paz waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Grace D. Lieblein: For Grace D. Lieblein waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Clive R. Hollick: For Clive R. Hollick waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Judd A. Gregg: For Judd A. Gregg waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Linnet F. Deily: For Linnet F. Deily waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by D. Scott Davis: For D. Scott Davis waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jaime Chico Pardo: For Jaime Chico Pardo waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kevin Burke: For Kevin Burke waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by William S. Ayer: For William S. Ayer waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Duncan B. Angove: For Duncan B. Angove waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Darius E. Adamczyk: For Darius E. Adamczyk waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Honeywell International Inc.: For Honeywell International Inc. waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Choa, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sandra C. Goldstein and Rachel M. Fritzler for Darius E. Adamczyk added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sandra C. Goldstein and Rachel M. Fritzler of Kirkland & Ellis LLP filed by Robin L. Washington, William S. Ayer, George Paz, Greg Lewis, Jaime Chico Pardo, D. Scott Davis, Grace D. Lieblein, Kevin Burke, Linnet F. Deily, David M. Cote, Judd A. Gregg, Duncan B. Angove, Thomas A. Szlosek, Darius E. Adamczyk, Honeywell International Inc., Clive R. Hollick. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/27/2019. (nmf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sandra C. Goldstein and Rachel M. Fritzler of Kirkland & Ellis LLP - filed by Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Greg Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington. (Choa, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Choa on behalf of Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Greg Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington (Choa, Jonathan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. David M. Cote served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Robin L. Washington served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Thomas A. Szlosek served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. George Paz served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Grace D. Lieblein served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Greg Lewis served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Honeywell International Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Clive R. Hollick served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Judd A. Gregg served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Linnet F. Deily served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. D. Scott Davis served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Jaime Chico Pardo served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Kevin Burke served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. William S. Ayer served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Steven R. Nusbaum. Duncan B. Angove served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Honeywell International Inc.. Darius E. Adamczyk served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Serra, Gina)
June 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Darius E. Adamczyk on 6/6/2019; Duncan B. Angove on 6/6/2019; William S. Ayer on 6/6/2019; Kevin Burke on 6/6/2019; David M. Cote on 6/6/2019; D. Scott Davis on 6/6/2019; Linnet F. Deily on 6/6/2019; Judd A. Gregg on 6/6/2019; Clive R. Hollick on 6/6/2019; Honeywell International Inc. on 6/6/2019; Greg Lewis on 6/6/2019; Grace D. Lieblein on 6/6/2019; Jaime Chico Pardo on 6/6/2019; George Paz on 6/6/2019; Thomas A. Szlosek on 6/6/2019; Robin L. Washington on 6/6/2019. (rwc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint,, by Steven R. Nusbaum. (Long, Brian)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 14, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/14/2019. (amf)
May 14, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to duty judge (CFC). (amf)
May 14, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Greg Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, and Robin L. Washington - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2641597) - filed by Steven R. Nusbaum. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal - filed by Steven R. Nusbaum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nusbaum v. Adamczyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Szlosek
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clive R. Hollick
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace D. Lieblein
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Chico Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L. Washington
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Burke
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Cote
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnet F. Deily
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius E. Adamczyk
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Sandra C. Goldstein
Represented By: Rachel M. Fritzler
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Paz
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judd A. Gregg
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Ayer
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan B. Angove
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lewis
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Davis
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Chico Pardo
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Nusbaum
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?