In Re: Gregory Brian Myers

Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Appellant: Gregory Brian Myers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00910
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure to Comply with the Court's 5/23/2019 Order. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/2/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Debtor/Appellant*** (dlw)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Appellant/Debtor shall pay the $298 filing fee, payable to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or submit a complete application to proceed without prepayment of fees (AO Form239, copy attached) to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (Office of Clerk). Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/13/2019.Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 05/23/2019. (myr)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00906-MN, 1:19-cv-00907-MN, 1:19-cv-00908-MN, 1:19-cv-00909-MN, 1:19-cv-00910-MN(nmg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
May 15, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
May 15, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 5/2/2019 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 19-10392. Fee Status not Paid. - filed by Gregory Brian Myers. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Gregory Brian Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Represented By: Michael B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gregory Brian Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?