CamCal Enterprises, LLC v. Toumi et al

Plaintiff: CamCal Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Sotomy and Mohammed Yassine Toumi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00911
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Robert M. Vrana re #6 Letter filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 6/21/2019 (dlw).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to John A. Cerino from Robert M. Vrana regarding Service of the Summons/Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) - re Summons Issued. (Vrana, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sotomy on 6/21/2019; Mohammed Yassine Toumi on 6/21/2019. (myr)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (ceg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. (ceg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) Reg. No. 4,603,083; Reg. No. 5,104,931; US 9,505,527; US 9,637,270; US 10,118,735. (ceg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s): VA2-150-113 (*copy mailed to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office). (ceg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT, TRADEMARK, AND PATENT INFRINGEMENT, UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND FALSE ADVERTISING filed with Jury Demand against Sotomy, Mohammed Yassine Toumi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2643636.) - filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CamCal Enterprises, LLC v. Toumi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CamCal Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotomy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Yassine Toumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?