Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Lupin Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ferring B.V., Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Ferring International Center S.A.
Defendant: Lupin Ltd., Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00913
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to July 19, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA answer due 7/19/2019; Lupin Inc. answer due 7/19/2019; Lupin Ltd. answer due 7/19/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2019. (nms)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to July 19, 2019 - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
June 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John W. Cox for Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A., and Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Cox, filed by Ferring B.V., Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ferring International Center S.A.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/29/2019. (nms)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Cox - filed by Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A., Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Severance, Dana)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 15, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA answer due 7/15/2019; Lupin Inc. answer due 7/15/2019; Lupin Ltd. answer due 7/15/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 7/15/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/28/2019. (nms)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 15, 2019 - filed by Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A., Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Bourke, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Bourke, Mary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A.. Lupin Inc. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Bourke, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Inc. on 5/16/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 5/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,827,231; US 9,669,110. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/4/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/23/2034 (as to US 9,827,231).Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/4/2021 (as to US 9,827,231). (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2644331.) - filed by Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ferring B.V., Ferring International Center S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Lupin Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferring B.V.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Daniel Marcus Attaway
Represented By: John W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Daniel Marcus Attaway
Represented By: John W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferring International Center S.A.
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Daniel Marcus Attaway
Represented By: John W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?