In re: Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.

Appellee: Louis Bridges, Jonathon P. Reuben, P.C. and Mark Dunaway
Debtor: Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.
Appellant: Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Liquidation Trustee for the Citadel Creditors Grantor Trust, successor to Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00915
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Mark Dunaway Counter-Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Dick, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, June 11, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/21/19. (cak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (ceg)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 5/2/2019 by Judge Kevin J. Carey in Bankruptcy case number 17-50024 LSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Liquidation Trustee for the Citadel Creditors Grantor Trust, successor to Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louis Bridges
Represented By: John D. Balaguer
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jonathon P. Reuben, P.C.
Represented By: Loren R. Barron
Represented By: John A. Elzufon
Represented By: Gary W. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Dunaway
Represented By: Robert W. Pedigo
Represented By: Robert Grant Dick, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Liquidation Trustee for the Citadel Creditors Grantor Trust, successor to Citadel Watford City Disposal Partners, L.P., et al.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Horan
Represented By: Johnna M. Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?