Murphy Marine Services, Inc. v. M/V Chiquita Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Murphy Marine Services, Inc.
Defendant: M/V Chiquita Angeles and Chiquita Brands Company North America
Not Yet Classified: Ring Marine Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00947
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00947-CFC, 1:19-cv-00989-CFC(nmf)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Barnett filed by Chiquita Brands Company North America, M/V Chiquita Angeles. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/18/2019. (fms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Barnett - filed by Chiquita Brands Company North America, M/V Chiquita Angeles. (deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Chiquita Brands International Srl for Chiquita Brands Company North America filed by Chiquita Brands Company North America. (deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Murphy Marine Services, Inc. by Chiquita Brands Company North America.(deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by M/V Chiquita Angeles. (deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M/V Chiquita Angeles.(deBruin, David)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chiquita Brands Company North America on 6/17/2019 (4 copies). (myr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Returned Executed: M/V Chiquita Angeles served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (fms) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/30/2019) (fms).
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Returned Executed: Ring Maritime Services served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (fms)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 23, 2019 WRIT to Restore Vessel issued. (Exit 3 original writs to USMS) (nmg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE filed by Arthur D. Kuhl on behalf of Murphy Marine Services, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Praecipe to Issue Writ to Restore Vessel; Writ to Restore; Process Receipt and Return (Attachments: #1 Writ to Restore, #2 Process Receipt and Return)(Kuhl, Arthur)
May 22, 2019 WARRANT issued. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting D.I. #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant for Arrest. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/22/2019. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting D.I. #3 MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian. Ring Marine Services appointed. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/22/2019. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re D.I. #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant for Arrest filed by Murphy Marine Services, Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2019. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant for Arrest - filed by Murphy Marine Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian - filed by Murphy Marine Services, Inc. (nmg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (dlw).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed against Chiquita Brands Company North America, M/V Chiquita Angeles - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031839.) - filed by Murphy Marine Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy Marine Services, Inc. v. M/V Chiquita Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Ring Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur D. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Chiquita Angeles
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brands Company North America
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?