Saunders v. Hall-Long et al
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Defendant: Hon. Jeffrey W. Bullock, Lt. Gov. Bethany A. Hall-Long, Hon. Colleen K. Davis, Hon. Kathleen F. McGuiness and Hon. Andre G. Bouchard
Case Number: 1:2019cv00957
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Remark: Copy work requested in D.I. #7 mailed to plaintiff on 6/14/2019. (receipt no. DEX031945) (amf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk of Court from Robert Saunders requesting copy work with enclosed check. (amf)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Robert Saunders. (ddp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue - filed by Robert Saunders. (ddp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Robert Saunders from Clerk of Court regarding request for copy work. (ddp) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/31/2019) (ddp).
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Clerk of Court from Robert Saunders, dated 3/31/2019, regarding request for copy work. (ddp)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, Punitive Relief, and Certify Class Action filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Hon. Andre G. Bouchard, Hon. Jeffrey W. Bullock, Hon. Colleen K. Davis, Lt. Gov. Bethany A. Hall-Long, and Hon. Kathleen F. McGuiness (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031850.) - filed by Robert Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-15)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Hall-Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Jeffrey W. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gov. Bethany A. Hall-Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Colleen K. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Kathleen F. McGuiness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Andre G. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?