Mercatus Technologies, Inc. et al v. Mercato, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mercatus Technologies, Inc. and Mercatus USA Inc.
Defendant: Mercato, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01076
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Robert J. Kenny and Michael T. Smith for Mercatus Technologies, Inc. and Mercatus USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Kenney and Michael T. Smith filed by Mercatus Technologies, Inc., Mercatus USA Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/12/2019. (fms)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Kenney and Michael T. Smith - filed by Mercatus Technologies, Inc., Mercatus USA Inc.. (O'Kelly, Sean)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mercato, Inc. on 6/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4,654,847 ;4,654,848 ;4,654,849. (myr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION filed with Jury Demand against Mercato, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2661530.) - filed by Mercatus Technologies, Inc., Mercatus USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercatus Technologies, Inc. et al v. Mercato, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercato, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercatus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Sean T. O'Kelly
Represented By: Robert J. Kenny
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercatus USA Inc.
Represented By: Sean T. O'Kelly
Represented By: Robert J. Kenny
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?