Maxus Liquidating Trust v. YPF S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Maxus Liquidating Trust
Defendant: Repsol E&P USA, Inc., CLH Holdings, Inc., Repsol E&P T&T Limited, YPF S.A., Repsol Services Co., Repsol Exploracion, S.A., Repsol, S.A., Repsol Offshore E&P USA, Inc., YPF Holdings, Inc., YPF International S.A. and Repsol USA Holdings Corp.
Debtor: Maxus Energy Corporation, et al.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01083
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SO ORDERED Granting (3 in 19-cv-1083-RGA, 3 in 19-cv-1073-RGA) Stipulation to Consolidate and Set Briefing Schedule (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Answering Brief due 7/22/2019, Reply Brief due 8/5/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/24/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01073-RGA, 1:19-cv-01083-RGA(nms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Consolidate and Set Briefing Schedule by Maxus Liquidating Trust. (Farnan, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 12, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/26/2019. (nms)
June 12, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Withdrawal record from case number AP 18-50489. (amf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - filed by CLH Holdings, Inc., YPF Holdings, Inc., YPF International S.A., and YPF S.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(amf) Modified on 6/19/2019 (nms).
June 12, 2019 Adversary Cause of Action: Recovery of Money/Property. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxus Liquidating Trust v. YPF S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol E&P USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLH Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol E&P T&T Limited
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YPF S.A.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol Services Co.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol Exploracion, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol Offshore E&P USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YPF Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YPF International S.A.
Represented By: Adam G. Landis
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol USA Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Curtis S. Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxus Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Maxus Energy Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?