Princeps Interface Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Princeps Interface Technologies LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01101
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick Delaney for Princeps Interface Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01101-CFC, 1:19-cv-01102-CFC, 1:19-cv-01103-CFC(kmd)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 6, 2019 filed by Apple Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/27/2019. (nmf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 6, 2019 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:19-cv-01102-CFC, 7 in 1:19-cv-01101-CFC, 7 in 1:19-cv-01103-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick R. Delaney filed by Princeps Interface Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01101-CFC, 1:19-cv-01102-CFC, 1:19-cv-01103-CFC(fms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick R. Delaney - filed by Princeps Interface Technologies LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Princeps Interface Technologies LLC. Apple Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01101-CFC, 1:19-cv-01102-CFC, 1:19-cv-01103-CFC (rjb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Princeps Interface Technologies LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffrey G. Toler as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Co-Counsel. (Devlin, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 6/14/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,703,963 B2. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2665278.) - filed by Princeps Interface Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeps Interface Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeps Interface Technologies LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Patrick Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?