Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC. v. CompanyCam, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC. and Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC
Defendant: CompanyCam, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01109
Filed: June 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CompanyCam, Inc. - filed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(dlw)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2019. (dlw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit B)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 8/5/2019 (dlw).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 5, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: CompanyCam, Inc. answer due 8/5/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/16/2019. (dlw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 5, 2019 - filed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC.. CompanyCam, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01108-MN, 1:19-cv-01109-MN (rjb)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CompanyCam, Inc. on 6/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ddp)
June 15, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC.. (ddp)
June 15, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 7,456,872 B2. (ddp)
June 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
June 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against CompanyCam, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2665779.) - filed by Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC. v. CompanyCam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Digital Confirmation, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CompanyCam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?