Cockett Marine Oil Limited v. Navig8 America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cockett Marine Oil Limited
Defendant: Integr8 Fuels, Inc.
Garnishee: Navig8 Bulk America LLC, Navig8 Chemicals America LLC, Amazon Registrar, Inc., Navig8 Product Tankers LLC, Integr8 Fuels America LLC and Navig8 America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01114
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #16 . (nms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cockett Marine Oil Limited as to Integr8 Fuels, Inc. and All Garnishees (Houseal, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Stephen Simms, filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2019. (nms)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 19, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc)
June 19, 2019 WRITS OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Amazon Registrar, Inc., Integr8 Fuels America LLC, Navig8 America LLC, Navig8 Bulk America LLC, Navig8 Chemicals America LLC, Navig8 Product Tankers LLC. (WRITS AVAILABLE FOR PICK-UP AT CLERK'S OFFICE) (rwc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Writs of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/19/19. (rwc) Modified on 6/19/2019 (nms).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/19/19. (rwc) Modified on 6/19/2019 (nms).
June 19, 2019 Remark: Duty Judge (MN) notified regarding Request for Expedited handling (DI 13). Counsel shall provide one courtesy copy of all documents to the Clerk's Office this morning or be charged copy fees at.50 page pursuant to the Judicial Conference guidelines. (rwc) Modified on 6/20/2019 (nms).
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to Mr. John A. Cerino, Clerk from Timothy Jay Houseal regarding Expedited Handling of Case. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Stephen Simms - filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Navig8 Chemicals America LLC by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Navig8 Product Tankers LLC by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Navig8 Bulk America LLC by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Integr8 Fuels America LLC by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Amazon Registrar, Inc. by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of for Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Regarding Navig8 America LLC by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 18, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Integr8 Fuels, Inc. on 6/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (amf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM in Support for Order Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment with attached Proposed Order - filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (amf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment with attached Proposed Order - filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (amf) Modified on 6/18/2019 (amf).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed against Integr8 Fuels, Inc., Amazon Registrar, Inc., Integr8 Fuels America LLC, Navig8 America LLC, Navig8 Bulk America LLC, Navig8 Chemicals America LLC, and Navig8 Product Tankers LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2666466) - filed by Cockett Marine Oil Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/18/2019) (myr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockett Marine Oil Limited v. Navig8 America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Navig8 Bulk America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Navig8 Chemicals America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Amazon Registrar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Navig8 Product Tankers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Integr8 Fuels America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Navig8 America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cockett Marine Oil Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integr8 Fuels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?