Crawley v. Saul

Plaintiff: Darla Crawley
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01119
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Social Security Administration (Benderson, Heather)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol filed by Darla Crawley. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/19/2019. (dlw)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 18, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel on 6/18/2019 per request. (amf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol - filed by Darla Crawley. (Linarducci, Gary)
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General on 6/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2666985.) - filed by Darla Crawley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Crawley
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?