In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Appellee: Future Claimant's Representative and Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Cypress Historical Excess Insurers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01120
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Diane Ramsey on behalf of Official Committee of Tort Claimants (Ramsey, Natalie)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS in case 1:19-cv-00944-MN, 1:19-cv-01120-MN, 1:19-cv-01121-MN, 1:19-cv-01122-MN. These matters are withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation. Appellants' request set forth in their 7/10/2019 is DENIED. Appellants' Opening Briefs are due 10/1/2019; Parties' Responsive Briefs are due within 60 days after the filing and service of Appellants' Opening Briefs; and Appellants' Reply Briefs are due within 30 days after the filing and service of the Parties' Responsive Briefs. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/2/2019. (dlw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for (Designation by the Debtors and the Future Claimants Representative of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal) re: D.I. #6 served on Multiple Parties see Affidavit of Service on 7/12/19, filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.. (Ramos, Marcos)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Marcos A. Ramos regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule - re #4 Letter, #5 Letter. (Ramos, Marcos)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Cypress Historical Excess Insurers Corrected (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Future Claimant's Representative, Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al. (Designation of Additional Items to be Included in Record of Appeal) (Harron, Edwin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding briefing schedule. (Weinblatt, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Marcos A. Ramos regarding briefing schedule. (Ramos, Marcos)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01120-MN, 1:19-cv-01121-MN, 1:19-cv-01122-MN (rjb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/24/19. (cak)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (rwc)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (rwc)
June 18, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (rwc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Letter Order ruling entered on 5/31/19 and Order entered 6/3/19 by the Honorable Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 19-10289 (LSS). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Cypress Historical Excess Insurers. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Letter Ruling dated 5/31/19, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Future Claimant's Representative
Represented By: Edwin J. Harron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Marcos Alexis Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cypress Historical Excess Insurers
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?