Kent v. Cray Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kent
Defendant: Stephen E. Gold, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Brian V. Turner, Catriona M. Fallon, Peter J. Ungaro, Daniel C. Regis, Cray Inc., Max L. Schireson, Prithviraj Banerjee, Canopy Merger Sub, Inc., Sally G. Narodick and Stephen C. Kiely
Case Number: 1:2019cv01157
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Kent (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Peter J. Ungaro waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Brian V. Turner waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Max L. Schireson waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Catriona M. Fallon waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Daniel C. Regis waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Sally G. Narodick waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Stephen C. Kiely waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Stephen E. Gold waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Prithviraj Banerjee waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kent: For Cray Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01148-LPS, 1:19-cv-01157-LPS, 1:19-cv-01188-LPS(nmg)
June 21, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Prithviraj Banerjee, Canopy Merger Sub, Inc., Cray Inc., Catriona M. Fallon, Stephen E. Gold, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Stephen C. Kiely, Sally G. Narodick, Daniel C. Regis, Max L. Schireson, Brian V. Turner, Peter J. Ungaro - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2670273.) - filed by Michael Kent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Cray Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kent
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian V. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catriona M. Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Ungaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Regis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cray Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max L. Schireson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prithviraj Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canopy Merger Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally G. Narodick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?