Smith v. Branch et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Alan Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Supervisor Lisa Daniels and Corrine Branch
Case Number: 1:2019cv01187
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Authorization by Floyd Alan Smith, Jr requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (nmg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Floyd Smith, from Clerk of Court, responding to copy-work request (D.I. #7 ). (sam) Modified on 8/9/2019 (nms).
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Floyd Smith regarding copywork and submitted D.I. #5 trust account statement. (sam)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Plaintiff shall forward payments from his account to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fee is paid (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2019. (lak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Floyd Alan Smith, Jr. (lak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/29/2019.) Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2019. (nmg)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Corrine Branch and Lisa Daniels - filed by Floyd Alan Smith, Jr.(nmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Floyd Alan Smith, Jr. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Branch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor Lisa Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Alan Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?