Fink v. Wilmington Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kristina Fink
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A., Andrew Smith, Frank Mennella and Michael Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv01193
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore M. Becker and Allison Crowe - filed by Frank Mennella, Andrew Smith, Michael Smith. (mmTownsend, Ethan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Haller mmTownsend on behalf of Frank Mennella, Andrew Smith, Michael Smith (mmTownsend, Ethan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kristina Fink: For Michael Smith waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Felice, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kristina Fink: For Frank Mennella waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Felice, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kristina Fink: For Andrew Smith waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Felice, David)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan T. Jenny filed by Kristina Fink. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/7/2019. (fms)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan T. Jenny - filed by Kristina Fink. (Felice, David)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Extended Until September 9, 2019 filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wilmington Trust, N.A. answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/17/2019. (nmf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Extended Until September 9, 2019 - filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Manwaring, Albert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Fink. Wilmington Trust, N.A. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Felice, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Y. Porter filed by Kristina Fink. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/10/2019. (nmf)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Y. Porter - filed by Kristina Fink. (Felice, David)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Frank Mennella; Andrew Smith; Michael Smith; and Wilmington Trust, N.A. on 6/25/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Frank Mennella, Andrew Smith, Michael Smith, and Wilmington Trust, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2672066) - filed by Kristina Fink. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. Wilmington Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Albert H. Manwaring, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Ethan Haller mmTownsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Mennella
Represented By: Ethan Haller mmTownsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smith
Represented By: Ethan Haller mmTownsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Fink
Represented By: David A. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?