Cohen v. Cohen
Plaintiff: Alicia A. Cohen
Defendant: Ronald A. Cohen, Rafi Cohen, Ron Cohen, Rafael Chaim Ha Cohen, Rafael Cohen, Rafa-El Cohen, Rafael Chaim Cohen and Ronnie Cohen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01219
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/22/2019. ***Copy mailed to pro se defendant 8/22/2019*** (dlw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to (D.I. #1 ) Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ronald A. Cohen.(nmg)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily Mather, Esq. for Alicia A. Cohen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephanie Richard for Alicia A. Cohen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ronald A. Cohen answer due 8/16/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/18/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 7/18/2019*** (dlw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Matthew Goeller, Esq. regarding Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. (Caponi, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer to D.I. #1 Complaint - filed by Ronald A. Cohen. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel J. Stephenson for Alicia A. Cohen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paula Tobler for Alicia A. Cohen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Stephenson, Esq., Emily Mather, Esq., Stephanie Richard, Esq. and Paula Tobler, Esq. filed by Alicia A. Cohen. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/3/2019. (dlw)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Stephenson, Esq., Emily Mather, Esq., Stephanie Richard, Esq. and Paula Tobler, Esq. - filed by Alicia A. Cohen. (Caponi, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alicia A. Cohen. Ronald A. Cohen served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Caponi, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ronald A. Cohen on 6/27/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CHILD SEXUAL ABUSE AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING filed with Jury Demand against Ronald A. Cohen - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2674429.) - filed by Alicia A. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafi Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Chaim Ha Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafa-El Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Chaim Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia A. Cohen
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Daniel J. Stephenson
Represented By: Emily Mather, Esq.
Represented By: Paula Tobler
Represented By: Stephanie Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?