Airgas, Inc. v. Hudson Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Airgas, Inc.
Defendant: Hudson Holdings, Inc. and Hudson Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01222
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #5 . (nms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Airgas, Inc. as to All Defendants (Wood, Larry)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to August 22, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Hudson Holdings, Inc. answer due 8/22/2019; Hudson Technologies, Inc. answer due 8/22/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2019. (nms)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to August 22, 2019 - filed by Hudson Holdings, Inc., Hudson Technologies, Inc.. (mmTownsend, Ethan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to August 1, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Hudson Holdings, Inc. answer due 8/1/2019; Hudson Technologies, Inc. answer due 8/1/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2019. (nms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to August 1, 2019 - filed by Hudson Holdings, Inc., Hudson Technologies, Inc.. (mmTownsend, Ethan)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 28, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Hudson Holdings, Inc. and Hudson Technologies, Inc. on 6/28/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Hudson Holdings, Inc. and Hudson Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2675179) - filed by Airgas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airgas, Inc. v. Hudson Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Haller mmTownsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Haller mmTownsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airgas, Inc.
Represented By: Larry R. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?