Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. Lupin, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01251
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin P. Burke,Jeffrey A Marx,Deanne M. Mazzochi,Paul J. Molino,William A. Rakoczy for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lupin, Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 filed by Lupin, Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019; Lupin, Ltd. answer due 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/17/2019. (fms)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lupin, Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melvin W. Gaddy for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,for Lupin, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melvin W. Gaddy filed by Lupin, Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/12/2019. (nmf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melvin W. Gaddy - filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke, Attorney Jeffrey A. Marx, Attorney Deanne M. Mazzochi, Attorney Paul J. Molino and Attorney William A. Rakoczy filed by Lupin, Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/11/2019. (nmf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke, Attorney Jeffrey A. Marx, Attorney Deanne M. Mazzochi, Attorney Paul J. Molino and Attorney William A. Rakoczy - filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin, Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc.: For Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Lupin, Ltd. waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
July 3, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/3/2019; Lupin, Ltd. on 7/3/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Janus Henderson Group PLC for Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc. filed by Cephalon, Inc.. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,597,398 B2; US 9,597,399 B2; US 10,010,533 B2; US 10,052,385 B2. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,572,796 B2; US 9,572,797 B2; US 9,572,887 B2; US 9,579,384 B2; US 9,597,397 B2. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,609,707 B2; US 9,000,021 B2; US 9,034,908 B2; US 9,144,568 B1; US 9,265,831 B2. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/21/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/21/2021. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2678396.) - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. Lupin, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: Jeffrey A Marx
Represented By: Melvin W. Gaddy
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin, Ltd.
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: Jeffrey A Marx
Represented By: Melvin W. Gaddy
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?