Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC et al v. Groundwork BioAg, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Helena Holding Company and Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Groundwork BioAg, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01303
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer Fraser for Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC, for Helena Holding Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew T. Hays for Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC, for Helena Holding Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew T. Hays and Jennifer Fraser filed by Helena Holding Company, Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/18/2019. (dlw)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew T. Hays and Jennifer Fraser - filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC, Helena Holding Company. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
July 12, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Marubeni America Corporation, Corporate Parent Marubeni Corporation for Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC; Corporate Parent Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC for Helena Holding Company filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC, Helena Holding Company. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 1,936,114 ;1,787,737 ;2,473,976. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Groundwork BioAg, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2684202.) - filed by Helena Holding Company, Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC et al v. Groundwork BioAg, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groundwork BioAg, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Holding Company
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Jennifer Fraser
Represented By: Matthew T. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Jennifer Fraser
Represented By: Matthew T. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?