NNCrystal US Corporation v. Nanosys, Inc.
Plaintiff: NNCrystal US Corporation
Defendant: Nanosys, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01307
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler E. Cragg on behalf of NNCrystal US Corporation (Cragg, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Kathleen Pedi on behalf of NNCrystal US Corporation (Pedi, Nicole)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of NNCrystal US Corporation (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Qingyu Yin, D. Brian Kacedon, Rajeev Gupta and Maximilienne Giannelli, filed by NNCrystal US Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2019. (nms)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Qingyu Yin, D. Brian Kacedon, Rajeev Gupta and Maximilienne Giannelli - filed by NNCrystal US Corporation. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 15, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Najing Technology Co. Ltd. for NNCrystal US Corporation filed by NNCrystal US Corporation. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,105,051. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nanosys, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2684605.) - filed by NNCrystal US Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NNCrystal US Corporation v. Nanosys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanosys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNCrystal US Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Pedi
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?