TFII Legacy, LLC v. Lummus Corporation

Plaintiff: TFII Legacy, LLC
Defendant: Lummus Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01309
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Oral Argument by TFII Legacy, LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Brooks, Andrea)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TFII Legacy, LLC. (Brooks, Andrea)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Lummus Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John H. McFarland for TFII Legacy, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John H. McFarland filed by TFII Legacy, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/17/2019. (nmf)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John H. McFarland - filed by TFII Legacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of John H. McFarland)(Bracegirdle, Thad)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by TFII Legacy, LLC: For Lummus Corporation waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Bracegirdle, Thad)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by TFII Legacy, LLC. (Bracegirdle, Thad)
July 15, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Lummus Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2685208.) - filed by TFII Legacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TFII Legacy, LLC v. Lummus Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lummus Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFII Legacy, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Schoch Brooks
Represented By: Thad J. Bracegirdle
Represented By: John H. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?