Smith v. People's Place II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald I. Smith
Defendant: People's Place II, Inc. and Joseph C. Zingaro
Case Number: 1:2019cv01325
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service previously filed as D.I. 14 has been deleted and attached to D.I. #13 . Counsel is advised that certificates of service are to be filed as attachments only. (lih)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by People's Place II, Inc.. (Shields, Colleen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (lih).
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re D.I. #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Gerald I. Smith. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2019. (amf)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/19/2019. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon.(nmf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen D. Shields on behalf of People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro (Shields, Colleen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #8 Opening Brief in Support, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogin, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogin, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rogin, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document: Exhibits to Opening Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificte of Service)(Rogin, Alexandra)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Gerald I. Smith. People's Place II, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (myr)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Gerald I. Smith. Joseph C. Zingaro served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (myr)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #1 MOTION to Seal filed by Gerald I. Smith. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/18/2019. (nmf)
July 17, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Judge Connolly (CFC). (lak)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to People's Place II, Inc. on 7/17/2019; Joseph C. Zingaro on 7/17/2019. (lak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 [SEALED] EXHIBIT A and B to #2 Complaint (Pro Se) - filed by Gerald I. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (lak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against People's Place II, Inc., Joseph C. Zingaro ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX032091.) - filed by Gerald I. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #2 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B - filed by Gerald I. Smith. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. People's Place II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald I. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Place II, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Zingaro
Represented By: Alexandra Rogin
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?