Demetrius Hernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Demetrius Hernandez
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Regional Finance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01331
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement Equifax Information Services, LLC, by Demetrius Hernandez (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 9/13/2019 (nms).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to September 13, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/13/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/14/2019. (nms)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to September 13, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetrius Hernandez as to Regional Finance Corporation only (Garibian, Antranig)
August 7, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed at D.I. 5 and D.I. 6 have been removed from the docket as these filings were duplicative of the summons returned at D.I. #3 and D.I. #4 . (nms)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrius Hernandez. Regional Finance Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrius Hernandez. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 7/17/2019; Regional Finance Corporation on 7/17/2019. (Mailed to Philadelphia office.)(mal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Regional Finance Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2687748.) - filed by Demetrius Hernandez.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demetrius Hernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Hernandez
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?