Clements v. NCB Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Clements
Defendant: NCB Management Services, Inc. and Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01332
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to NCB Management Services, Inc., by John Clements (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 8/13/2019 (nms).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, by John Clements (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 8/13/2019 (nms).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 9/11/19 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: NCB Management Services, Inc. answer due 9/11/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2019. (nms)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 9/11/19 - filed by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Cunningham on behalf of NCB Management Services, Inc. (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Clements. NCB Management Services, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association on 7/17/2019; NCB Management Services, Inc. on 7/17/2019. Summons mailed to Philadelphia office. (kmd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, NCB Management Services, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2687757.) - filed by John Clements. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. NCB Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clements
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?