Randolph Lucas v. Wilmington Police Department, et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Lucas
Defendant: Officer Schulz, Officer Lynch, Supervisor Gifford, Officer Law, Officer Nolan, Wilmington Police Department, Officer Ham and Officer Stephey
Case Number: 1:2019cv01338
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kosmowski, Edward)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Response Motion to OPPOSE D.I. #4 OPENING BRIEF and D.I. #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Randolph Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(mal)
September 5, 2019 Remark: Summons and Praecipes received on 9/4/2019 sent to case file. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kosmowski, Edward)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Civil Claim and 30 day Extension to Answer Defendant's Brief - filed by Randolph Lucas. (nmg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kosmowski, Edward)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel with Notice of Motion to compel and exhibit - filed by Randolph Lucas. (sam)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Police Department.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kosmowski, Edward)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Wilmington Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kosmowski, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N19C-06-014 MMJ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2688127)- filed by Wilmington Police Department, Officer Schulz, Supervisor Gifford, Officer Law, Officer Nolan, Officer Stephey, Officer Lynch, Officer Ham.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph Lucas v. Wilmington Police Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Schulz
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lynch
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor Gifford
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Law
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nolan
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Police Department
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ham
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stephey
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?