Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited et al v. Luye Pharma Group Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01340
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/19. (ntl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 [SEALED] MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Redact Transcript - filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding parties' upcoming meet and confer call. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 [SEALED] Letter to Jack B. Blumenfeld from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Response to Plaintiffs' September 9, 2019 Letter regarding proposed schedule - re #22 Letter. (Phillips, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 Letter to John C. Phillips, Jr. from Jack B. BLumenfeld regarding proposed schedule - re Telephone Conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding requesting that transcript be sealed. (Phillips, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Phillips, John)
September 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL'S EYES ONLY PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.2] Expert Report of Anil M. Doshi, R.Ph., Ph.D. filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Phillips, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., and Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL'S EYES ONLY] Non-Infringement Contentions filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Phillips, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., and Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Identification of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Phillips, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephone Conference scheduled for September 4 is CANCELLED and is RESCHEDULED for September 5 at 3:30 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/3/19. (ntl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Request to Reschedule Scheduling Teleconference. (Jacobs, Karen)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 3:30 PM to discuss the proposed scheduling order. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4571. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/29/19. (ntl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER -- [Proposed] Scheduling Order -- by Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Jacobs, Karen)
August 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yifang Zhao for Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Scott A. Cunning, II for Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Bilson, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., and Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A) and Paragraph 3 of the Delware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Electronically Stored Information filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Phillips, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than August 20, 2019. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/19. (ntl)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Cunning, II and Yifang Zhao - filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/29/19. (ntl)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Cunning, II and Yifang Zhao - filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Phillips, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Shorea LBG for Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Phillips, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Phillips, John)
July 18, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd. on 7/18/2019; Luye Pharma Group Ltd. on 7/18/2019; Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2019; Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alkermes plc, Corporate Parent Alkermes Ireland Holdings Limited for Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited filed by Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,667,061 B2. (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 6/05/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 5/25/2020 (with pediatric exclusivity Nov. 25, 2020). Thirty Month Stay Deadline: upon patent expiration (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd., Luye Pharma Group Ltd., Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2688262.) - filed by Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited, Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited et al v. Luye Pharma Group Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alkermes Controlled Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luye Pharma (USA) Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Represented By: Yifang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luye Pharma Group Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Represented By: Yifang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanjing Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Represented By: Yifang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shandong Luye Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Represented By: Yifang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?